HI HB1904 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-3)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-07 - Referred to EDU/PSM, JDC.
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-07 - Referred to EDU/PSM, JDC.
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides a process for school placement for a child whose parent or guardian has transferred or is pending transfer from another state to a military installation in Hawaii while on active military duty pursuant to an official military order. Effective 7/1/3000. (HD2)
Title
Relating To Education.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-07 | Senate | Referred to EDU/PSM, JDC. |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 253). |
2024-03-05 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cochran, Martinez, Woodson excused (3). Transmitted to Senate. |
2024-03-01 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-05-24. |
2024-03-01 | House | Reported from EDN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 869-24) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2024-02-15 | House | The committee on EDN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Woodson, La Chica, Kapela, Marten, Martinez, M. Mizuno, Todd, Garcia; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Matayoshi, Perruso, Quinlan. |
2024-02-12 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EDN on Thursday, 02-15-24 2:00PM in House conference room 309 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-02-12 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on EDN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Amato, Lowen, Nakashima, Quinlan, Todd excused (5). |
2024-02-12 | House | Reported from CMV (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 253-24) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to EDN. |
2024-02-07 | House | The committee on CMV recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Hashem, Chun, Ichiyama, M. Mizuno, Morikawa, Poepoe, Takayama, Souza; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ganaden. |
2024-02-02 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CMV on Wednesday, 02-07-24 9:30AM in House conference room 430 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-01-24 | House | Referred to CMV, EDN, referral sheet 1 |
2024-01-22 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2024-01-19 | House | Pending introduction. |