HI HB1872 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 31-4)
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-05 - Re-Referred to CPH/HMS, WAM.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Appropriates funds to the office of the long-term care ombudsman for an unspecified number of ombudsman specialist positions. Appropriates funds. Takes effect 12/31/2059. (HD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Making An Appropriation For The Office Of The Long-term Care Ombudsman Program.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-20 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-31 - House - House Human Services & Homelessness: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-05SenateRe-Referred to CPH/HMS, WAM.
2020-03-05SenateThe committee(s) on HMS deleted the measure from the public hearing scheduled on 03-06-20 2:45PM in conference room 016.
2020-03-03SenateThe committee(s) on HMS has scheduled a public hearing on 03-06-20 2:45PM in conference room 016.
2020-03-03SenateReferred to HMS, WAM.
2020-03-03SenatePassed First Reading.
2020-03-03SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 139).
2020-02-28HousePassed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, DeCoite, Holt, Thielen excused (4). Transmitted to Senate.
2020-02-28HouseReported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 823-20), recommending passage on Third Reading.
2020-02-20HouseThe committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Todd, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
2020-02-18HouseBill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 02-20-20 1:00PM in House conference room 308.
2020-02-10HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Gates excused (1).
2020-02-10HouseReported from HSH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 262-20) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
2020-01-31HouseThe committees on HSH recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) San Buenaventura, Nakamura, Belatti, B. Kobayashi, Mizuno, Tokioka, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Say.
2020-01-27HouseBill scheduled to be heard by HSH on Friday, 01-31-20 8:30AM in House conference room 329.
2020-01-23HouseReferred to HSH, FIN, referral sheet 3
2020-01-21HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.
2020-01-17HousePending introduction.

Same As/Similar To

SB2337 (Same As) 2020-03-13 - The committees on HSH recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) San Buenaventura, Nakamura, Belatti, B. Kobayashi, Tokioka, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Mizuno, Say.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback