HI HB1867 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-27 - The committee(s) on FIN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-27 - The committee(s) on FIN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amends notice and community engagement requirements for Hawaii Community Development Authority meetings and decision making. Amends development guidance requirements, prohibitions, and application procedures for the Kakaako Community Development District. Effective July 1, 2020. (HB1867 HD1)
Title
Kakaako Community Development District; Prohibitions
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] | Rep. Della au Belatti [D] | Rep. Tom Brower [D] | Rep. Bertrand Kobayashi [D] |
Sen. Angus McKelvey [D] | Rep. Scott Nishimoto [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-27 | House | The committee(s) on FIN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2014-02-26 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Thursday, 02-27-14 2:00PM in conference room 308. |
2014-02-26 | House | The committee(s) on FIN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02/27/14 at 2:00 PM. |
2014-02-24 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 02-26-14 2:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2014-02-14 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Cullen, Fale, Fukumoto, Har, Jordan, Kawakami, Lowen, Oshiro, Tokioka voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Hanohano, Ito, Say voting no (3) and Representative(s) Cachola, Carroll, Creagan, Nakashima, Takumi excused (5). |
2014-02-14 | House | Reported from WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 546-14) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2014-02-11 | House | The committees on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Evans, Lowen, C. Lee, Nishimoto, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Cullen, Kawakami, Fale; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Say; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Hanohano. |
2014-02-10 | House | Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org |
2014-02-10 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 02-11-14 10:15AM in conference room 325. |
2014-02-08 | House | The committee(s) on WAL recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-11-14, 10:15a.m. |
2014-01-28 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by WAL on Saturday, 02-08-14 8:30AM in House conference room 325. |
2014-01-21 | House | Referred to WAL, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2014-01-21 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2014-01-17 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2696 (Same As) 2014-03-04 - Recommitted to WAM.