HI HB1865 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-27 - The committee(s) on FIN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-27 - The committee(s) on FIN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the Auditor to conduct a management and financial audit of the Hawaii Community Development Authority and report its findings to the Legislature. (HB1865 HD1)
Title
Hawaii Community Development Authority; Kakaako; Auditor Study
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] | Rep. Della au Belatti [D] | Rep. Tom Brower [D] | Rep. Bertrand Kobayashi [D] |
Sen. Angus McKelvey [D] | Rep. Scott Nishimoto [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-27 | House | The committee(s) on FIN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2014-02-26 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Thursday, 02-27-14 2:00PM in conference room 308. |
2014-02-26 | House | The committee(s) on FIN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02/27/14 at 2:00 PM. |
2014-02-24 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 02-26-14 2:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2014-02-14 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cachola, Carroll, Creagan, Nakashima, Takumi excused (5). |
2014-02-14 | House | Reported from WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 545-14) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2014-02-11 | House | The committees on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Evans, Lowen, C. Lee, Say, Nishimoto, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Cullen, Kawakami, Fale; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Hanohano. |
2014-02-10 | House | Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org |
2014-02-10 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 02-11-14 10:15AM in conference room 325. |
2014-02-08 | House | The committee(s) on WAL recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-11-14, 10:15a.m. |
2014-01-28 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by WAL on Saturday, 02-08-14 8:30AM in House conference room 325. |
2014-01-21 | House | Referred to WAL, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2014-01-21 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2014-01-17 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB3031 (Same As) 2014-01-27 - Referred to EGH, WAM.