HI HB1860 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-02 - (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on HLT with none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McKelvey, Pine, Tokioka excused (3).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-02 - (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on HLT with none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McKelvey, Pine, Tokioka excused (3).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Designates disability and communication access board as issuing agency for removable windshield placards, temporary removable windshield placards, special license plates, and identification cards. Deletes counties as issuing agency. Increases qualifying disability from four to six years. (HB1860 HD1)
Title
Parking for Disabled Persons
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-02 | (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on HLT with none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McKelvey, Pine, Tokioka excused (3). | |
2010-02-02 | (H) Reported from TRN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 25-10) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to HLT. | |
2010-01-27 | (H) .The committees on TRN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Souki, Awana, Aquino, Hanohano, Keith-Agaran, M. Lee, Nakashima, Rhoads, Saiki, Takumi, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Pine. | |
2010-01-22 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by TRN on Wednesday, 01-27-10 8:30 AM in House conference room 309. | |
2010-01-20 | (H) Referred to TRN, HLT, FIN, referral sheet 1 | |
2010-01-20 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2010-01-13 | (H) Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2105 (Same As) 2010-05-25 - (S) Act 141, 5/25/2010 (Gov. Msg. No. 599).