HI HB1823 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 25-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-28 - Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 801).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-28 - Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 801).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes advanced practice registered nurses and physician assistants to practice medical aid in dying or provide counseling to a qualified patient. Requires an attending provider to make an initial determination in person or via telehealth. Amends the mandatory waiting period between oral requests and the provision of a prescription. Prohibits the disclosure, discovery, or compelled production of information collected or retained pursuant to incidental or routine communication between DOH and qualified patients or providers. Effective 7/1/2060. (SD2)
Title
Relating To Health.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-01 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-01 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Consumer Protection: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-21 - Senate - Senate Health: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-25 - House - House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - House - House Consumer Protection & Commerce: Passed, Unamended (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - House - House Health, Human Services, & Homelessness: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-01 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Consumer Protection: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-21 - Senate - Senate Health: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-25 - House - House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - House - House Consumer Protection & Commerce: Passed, Unamended (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - House - House Health, Human Services, & Homelessness: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-28 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 801). |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-28-22 5:40PM; Conference Room 329. |
2022-04-26 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Yamane, Johanson, Nakashima Co-Chairs; Hashimoto, Tam, Matsumoto. |
2022-04-19 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 879). |
2022-04-19 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Keohokalole Chair; Baker, Rhoads Co-Chairs; Moriwaki, Fevella. |
2022-04-18 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 715). |
2022-04-14 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2022-04-12 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 795) in amended form (SD 2). |
2022-04-12 | Senate | Report Adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 21; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Misalucha. Noes, 4 (Senator(s) Fevella, Gabbard, Kim, Riviere). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2022-04-08 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-12-22. |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Reported from CPN/JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3855) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2022-04-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Keohokalole, Acasio, Lee; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Kim ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Gabbard; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella. |
2022-04-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Chang, DeCoite, Nishihara, San Buenaventura; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Riviere; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella. |
2022-03-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN/JDC will hold a public decision making on 04-01-22 10:30AM; Conference Room 016 & Videoconference. |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to CPN/JDC. |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Reported from HTH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3367) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to CPN/JDC. |
2022-03-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on HTH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HTH were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keohokalole, Baker, San Buenaventura; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Fevella; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Moriwaki. |
2022-03-18 | Senate | The committee(s) on HTH has scheduled a public hearing on 03-21-22 1:10PM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference. |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Referred to HTH, CPN/JDC. |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 271). |
2022-03-08 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) Matsumoto voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Eli, Har, Kitagawa, Kong, McDermott, McKelvey, Okimoto, Tokioka, Ward voting no (9) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2022-03-04 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-08-22. |
2022-03-04 | House | Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 954-22) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2022-02-25 | House | The committees on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Matayoshi, Ichiyama, D. Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, Takumi, Tokioka; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) McKelvey; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Ward; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Nakamura. |
2022-02-24 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Friday, 02-25-22 2:00PM in conference room 325 Via Videoconference. |
2022-02-24 | House | The committee(s) on JHA recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-25-22. |
2022-02-22 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Thursday, 02-24-22 2:00PM in House conference room 325 Via Videoconference. |
2022-02-18 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on JHA with Representative(s) Matayoshi, McKelvey voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Har, Kitagawa, Kong, Matsumoto, McDermott, Okimoto, Quinlan, Tokioka, Ward voting no (9) and Representative(s) Eli, Kapela excused (2). |
2022-02-18 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 606-22), recommending referral to JHA. |
2022-02-15 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Morikawa, Onishi, Tarnas; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Har, Matsumoto; 2 Noes: Representative(s) Kitagawa, Kong; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Aquino, Hashem, Mizuno. |
2022-02-11 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Tuesday, 02-15-22 2:00PM in House conference room 329 Via Videoconference. |
2022-02-10 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with Representative(s) Matayoshi, Matsumoto, Quinlan, Tokioka voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Eli, Har, Kitagawa, Kong, Okimoto, Ward voting no (6) and Representative(s) McDermott excused (1). |
2022-02-10 | House | Reported from HHH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 191-22) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. |
2022-02-01 | House | The committees on HHH recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Tam, Gates, Kapela, Nishimoto; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Har; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Ward; and Excused: none. |
2022-01-27 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HHH on Tuesday, 02-01-22 10:30AM in House conference room 329 Via Videoconference. |
2022-01-26 | House | Referred to HHH, CPC, JHA, referral sheet 2 |
2022-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2022-01-21 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2680 (Same As) 2022-03-10 - Referred to HHH/CPC, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 24
Subjects
Advanced Practice Registered Nurses
Information
Mandatory Waiting Period
Our Care, Our Choice Act
Physician Assistants
Information
Mandatory Waiting Period
Our Care, Our Choice Act
Physician Assistants