HI HB1809 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-11 - The committee(s) on HUS recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-11 - The committee(s) on HUS recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the task force on medicaid payment and reimbursement. Appropriates funds for the staffing, operations, and convening of the task force. Effective July 1, 2014.
Title
Task Force; Medicaid Payments and Reimbursement; Appropriation ($)
Sponsors
Rep. John Mizuno [D] | Sen. Henry Aquino [D] | Rep. Rida Cabanilla Arakawa [D] | Rep. Ty Cullen [D] |
Rep. Faye Hanohano [D] | Sen. Angus McKelvey [D] | Rep. Mark Takai [D] | Rep. Clift Tsuji [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-11 | House | The committee(s) on HUS recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2014-02-03 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HUS on Tuesday, 02-11-14 9:30AM in House conference room 329. |
2014-01-21 | House | Referred to HUS, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2014-01-21 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2014-01-17 | House | Pending introduction. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1809&year=2014 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2014/Bills/HB1809_.HTM |