HI HB1777 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 30-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-23 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-23 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the Department of the Attorney General to establish a five-year commercial sexual exploitation of children data pilot program. Requires annual reporting to the Legislature and making the data and report publicly available. Appropriates moneys. (SD1)
Title
Relating To The Commercial Sexual Exploitation Of Children.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-15 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - House - House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - House - House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-23 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3349) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2022-03-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Keohokalole, Acasio, Gabbard, Kim, Lee, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2022-03-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 03-15-22 9:30AM; Conference Room 016 & Videoconference. |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Referred to JDC, WAM. |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 37). |
2022-03-03 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Matayoshi, Todd excused (2). Transmitted to Senate. |
2022-03-03 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 744-22), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2022-02-24 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Yamashita, Branco, Eli, Holt, Ilagan, B. Kobayashi, Marten, Nishimoto, Perruso, Sayama, Tam, Todd, Wildberger; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott. |
2022-02-22 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 02-24-22 11:00AM in House conference room 308 Via Videoconference. |
2022-02-11 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott excused (1). |
2022-02-11 | House | Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 218-22) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2022-02-03 | House | The committees on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Matayoshi, Ichiyama, D. Kobayashi, McKelvey, Nakamura, Takumi, Todd, Tokioka; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) LoPresti, Lowen, Ward. |
2022-01-31 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Thursday, 02-03-22 2:00PM in House conference room 325 Via Videoconference. |
2022-01-26 | House | Referred to JHA, FIN, referral sheet 2 |
2022-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2022-01-21 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2368 (Same As) 2022-02-15 - The committee on GVO deferred the measure.
SB2638 (Same As) 2022-03-10 - Referred to JHA, FIN, referral sheet 24
SB2638 (Same As) 2022-03-10 - Referred to JHA, FIN, referral sheet 24