HI HB1734 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-12 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with Representative(s) Jordan, Kawakami voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Tokioka excused (1).
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-12 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with Representative(s) Jordan, Kawakami voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Tokioka excused (1).
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Creates administrative penalties for any person who knowingly captures, kills, or takes any shark or ray within state marine waters. Provides exemptions for native Hawaiian gathering rights and cultural practices, research purposes, and public and personal safety. (HB1734 HD1)
Title
Sharks; Rays; Poaching and Commercial Fishing Prohibited
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-12 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with Representative(s) Jordan, Kawakami voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Tokioka excused (1). |
2016-02-12 | House | Reported from OMH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 267-16) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. |
2016-02-10 | House | The committees on OMH recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Ing, Lowen, Cullen, C. Lee, Yamane, Pouha, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Evans, Nishimoto, Say. |
2016-02-09 | House | Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org |
2016-02-05 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by OMH on Wednesday, 02-10-16 9:00AM in House conference room 325. |
2016-02-02 | House | Re-referred to OMH, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 6 |
2016-01-25 | House | Referred to OMH, JUD, referral sheet 1 |
2016-01-22 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2016-01-21 | House | Pending introduction. |