HI HB1716 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-21 - Referred to HSG/WLH/FIN, referral sheet 2
Pending: House Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-21 - Referred to HSG/WLH/FIN, referral sheet 2
Pending: House Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides to each county legislative body the ability to review and approve land use district boundary amendments for affordable housing projects on 15 acres or less.
Title
Relating To Housing Development.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-21 | House | Referred to HSG/WLH/FIN, referral sheet 2 |
2020-01-16 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2020-01-15 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2172 (Same As) 2020-02-04 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Subjects
Affordable Housing Land Use District Boundary Amendment
Hawaii State Association of Counties (HSAC) Package
Housing Development
Hawaii State Association of Counties (HSAC) Package
Housing Development
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1716&year=2020 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2020/bills/HB1716_.HTM |