HI HB1701 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-02 - The committee(s) on HUS recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-02 - The committee(s) on HUS recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
In child custody and visitation proceedings involving an allegation or history of family violence: 1) requires family courts to first hold an evidentiary hearing on the issue of family violence; 2) requires child custody evaluators to have qualifications relevant to the subject of family violence; and 3) if the proceeding does not involve mental health issues, prohibits disqualification of a person for appointment as a child custody evaluator solely because the person does not hold a degree relating to mental health. Prohibits use of a parent's good faith allegation of family violence as a factor that weighs against the parent in determining child custody or visitation. Requires family court judges and professional personnel to complete ongoing training in the latest best practices and research in domestic violence advocacy.
Title
Family Courts; Child Custody and Visitation; Domestic Violence
Sponsors
Rep. John Mizuno [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-02 | House | The committee(s) on HUS recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2016-02-02 | House | Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org |
2016-01-27 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HUS on Tuesday, 02-02-16 9:00AM in House conference room 329. |
2016-01-25 | House | Referred to HUS, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 1 |
2016-01-22 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2016-01-21 | House | Pending introduction. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1701&year=2016 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2016/bills/HB1701_.HTM |