HI HB1676 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-16 - The committee(s) on JHA recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-16 - The committee(s) on JHA recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires that the sexual orientation and gender identity of persons processed for crimes be included in the systems of identification, if disclosed. Requires that sexual orientation and gender identity information collected under this measure remain confidential and be used strictly for statistical research and data analysis purposes. Effective 7/1/3000. (HD1)
Title
Relating To Data Collection.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-02 - House - House Corrections, Military, & Veterans: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-16 | House | The committee(s) on JHA recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2022-02-14 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Wednesday, 02-16-22 2:00PM in House conference room 325 Via Videoconference. |
2022-02-09 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Luke, McDermott excused (2). |
2022-02-09 | House | Reported from CMV (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 122-22) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JHA. |
2022-02-02 | House | The committees on CMV recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Ohno, Ganaden, Branco, B. Kobayashi, Kong, Morikawa, Tarnas; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott. |
2022-01-31 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CMV on Wednesday, 02-02-22 10:00AM in House conference room 430 Via Videoconference. |
2022-01-26 | House | Referred to CMV, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 2 |
2022-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2022-01-21 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2872 (Same As) 2022-03-10 - Referred to CMV, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 24