HI HB1646 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-08 - The committee(s) on EEP recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Energy & Environmental Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-08 - The committee(s) on EEP recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Energy & Environmental Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits the sale or distribution of consumer goods for which a deceptive claim about the recyclability of the product or packaging is made. Requires the department of health to collect data and issue a material characterization study on recyclable materials collected in the State. Establishes standards for recyclability of products in the State. Prohibits the sale of any product that is labeled as compostable or biodegradable unless the product meets specified criteria.
Title
Relating To The Environment.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-08 | House | The committee(s) on EEP recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2022-02-03 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 02-08-22 8:50AM in conference room 325 Via Videoconference. |
2022-02-03 | House | The committee(s) on EEP recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-08-22 at 8:50AM. |
2022-01-31 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP on Thursday, 02-03-22 9:05AM in House conference room 325 Via Videoconference. |
2022-01-26 | House | Referred to EEP, CPC, referral sheet 2 |
2022-01-21 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2022-01-20 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2846 (Same As) 2022-01-24 - Referred to AEN/HTH, CPN/JDC.
Subjects
Ban
Biodegradability
Compostability
Consumer Goods
Deceptive Claim
Department of Health
Labeling
Packaging
Recyclability
Biodegradability
Compostability
Consumer Goods
Deceptive Claim
Department of Health
Labeling
Packaging
Recyclability
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1646&year=2022 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2022/bills/HB1646_.HTM |