HI HB1635 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-08 - This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Saturday 02-13-16 9:00AM in conference room Auditorium.
Pending: House Water & Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-08 - This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Saturday 02-13-16 9:00AM in conference room Auditorium.
Pending: House Water & Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that a lessee shall have the option to purchase commercial real property under certain conditions.
Title
Commercial Real Property; Leasehold; Lease to Fee Conversion
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-08 | House | This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Saturday 02-13-16 9:00AM in conference room Auditorium. |
2016-02-05 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by WAL on Saturday, 02-13-16 9:00AM in House conference room Auditorium. |
2016-01-25 | House | Referred to WAL, JUD, referral sheet 1 |
2016-01-21 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2016-01-20 | House | Pending introduction. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1635&year=2016 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2016/bills/HB1635_.HTM |