HI HB1620 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-16 - Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 609).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-16 - Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 609).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires insurers to provide a choice to the insured consumer of authorizing a repair provider to utilize a like kind and quality crash part or the original equipment manufacturer crash part. Specifies that an insured consumer who chooses the use of an original equipment manufacturer crash part that would affect the insured consumer's crash avoidance or safety systems shall not be required to pay the additional cost for repairs using that original equipment manufacturer crash part. Specifies that an insured consumer who chooses the use of an original equipment manufacturer crash part that would not affect the insured consumer's crash avoidance or safety systems shall pay the additional cost of the original equipment manufacturer crash part that is in excess of the equivalent like kind and quality crash part, unless original equipment manufacturer crash parts are required by the vehicle manufacturer's warranty or the use of a like kind and quality crash part would void an existing manufacturer's warranty or the insured consumer's vehicle lease agreement. Effective 7/1/2050. Sunsets 7/1/2023. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Motor Vehicle Repairs.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-16 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 609). |
2018-04-16 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Ohno, Takumi Co-Chairs; Choy, Fukumoto, Ward. |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 546). |
2018-04-10 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2018-04-06 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 556) in amended form (SD 1). |
2018-04-06 | Senate | Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 22; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 3 (Senator(s) Harimoto, Inouye, K. Kahele). Transmitted to House. |
2018-04-04 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-06-18. |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Reported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3422) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2018-03-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, S. Chang, Espero, Ihara, Ruderman; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Tokuda, Nishihara. |
2018-03-16 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 03-22-18 9:15AM in conference room 229. |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Referred to CPH. |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 262). |
2018-03-06 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Woodson excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2018-03-02 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-06-18. |
2018-03-02 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1074-18) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2018-02-21 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Ichiyama, Aquino, Ito, Johanson, LoPresti, Mizuno, Say, Tokioka, Yamane, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2018-02-16 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Wednesday, 02-21-18 2:00PM in House conference room 329. |
2018-02-16 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Ing, Nakamura, Onishi, Woodson excused (5). |
2018-02-16 | House | Reported from IAC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 652-18) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. |
2018-01-31 | House | The committees on IAC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Ohno, Choy, Cachola, Ito, LoPresti, Onishi, Woodson; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Fukumoto; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Tokioka, Ward. |
2018-01-26 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by IAC on Wednesday, 01-31-18 9:00AM in House conference room 429. |
2018-01-17 | House | Referred to IAC, CPC, referral sheet 3 |
2018-01-17 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading |
2018-01-10 | House | Prefiled. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2243 (Same As) 2018-03-08 - Referred to IAC, CPC, referral sheet 35
Subjects
Aftermarket Parts
Motor Vehicle Insurance
Original Equipment Manufacturer Parts
Repair
Vehicle Repair Practices Task Force
Motor Vehicle Insurance
Original Equipment Manufacturer Parts
Repair
Vehicle Repair Practices Task Force