HI SB2243 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-03-08 - Referred to IAC, CPC, referral sheet 35
Pending: House Intrastate Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requires insurers to provide a choice to the insured consumer of authorizing a repair provider to utilize a like kind and quality crash part or the original equipment manufacturer crash part. Specifies that an insured consumer who chooses the use of an original equipment manufacturer crash part that would affect the insured consumer's crash avoidance or safety systems shall not be required to pay the additional cost for repairs using that original equipment manufacturer crash part. Specifies that an insured consumer who chooses the use of an original equipment manufacturer crash part that would not affect the insured consumer's crash avoidance or safety systems shall pay the additional cost of the original equipment manufacturer crash part that is in excess of the equivalent like kind and quality crash part, unless original equipment manufacturer crash parts are required by the vehicle manufacturer's warranty or the use of a like kind and quality crash part would void an existing manufacturer's warranty or the insured consumer's vehicle lease agreement. Effective 7/1/2050. Sunsets 7/1/2023. (SD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Motor Vehicle Repairs.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-08HouseReferred to IAC, CPC, referral sheet 35
2018-03-08HousePass First Reading
2018-03-06HouseReceived from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 127) in amended form (SD 1).
2018-03-06SenatePassed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
2018-03-02Senate48 Hrs. Notice 03-06-18.
2018-03-02SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1).
2018-03-02SenateReported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2645) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
2018-02-23SenateThe committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Tokuda, S. Chang, Espero, Ihara, Nishihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Ruderman.
2018-02-20SenateThe committee(s) on CPH deferred the measure until 02-23-18 11:00AM in conference room 229.
2018-02-16SenateThe committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-20-18 9:00AM in conference room 229.
2018-01-22SenateReferred to CPH.
2018-01-22SenatePassed First Reading.
2018-01-19SenateIntroduced.

Same As/Similar To

HB1620 (Same As) 2018-04-16 - Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 609).

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback