HI HB1619 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-05 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with Representative(s) Har, McDermott, Nakamura, Thielen, Tupola voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Ward voting no (1) and Representative(s) Souki, Todd excused (2).
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-05 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with Representative(s) Har, McDermott, Nakamura, Thielen, Tupola voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Ward voting no (1) and Representative(s) Souki, Todd excused (2).
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Places restrictions on the ability of financial institutions to sell residential mortgage loans to other financial institutions. Defines "residential mortgage loans" as any loan primarily for personal, family, or household use that is secured by a mortgage, deed of trust, or other equivalent consensual security interest on a dwelling or residential real estate upon which is constructed or intended to be constructed a dwelling, and includes refinancings, reverse mortgages, home equity lines of credit, and other first and additional lien loans that meet the qualifications of the definition. (HB1619 HD1)
Title
Relating To Financial Institutions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-05 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with Representative(s) Har, McDermott, Nakamura, Thielen, Tupola voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Ward voting no (1) and Representative(s) Souki, Todd excused (2). |
2018-02-05 | House | Reported from HSG (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 49-18) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. |
2018-01-30 | House | The committees on HSG recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Aquino, Quinlan, San Buenaventura; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Brower, Nakamura, McDermott; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Hashem. |
2018-01-26 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HSG on Tuesday, 01-30-18 9:30AM in House conference room 423. |
2018-01-26 | House | Re-referred to HSG, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 6 |
2018-01-17 | House | Referred to HSG, CPC, referral sheet 3 |
2018-01-17 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading |
2018-01-10 | House | Prefiled. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2062 (Same As) 2018-02-15 - The committee on CPH deferred the measure.