HI HB161 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-01-26 - Referred to TRN, JUD, referral sheet 1
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-01-26 - Referred to TRN, JUD, referral sheet 1
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the offense of habitually operating a vehicle under the influence of an intoxicant to include operating a vehicle under the influence of an intoxicant after at least one conviction within the previous ten years for habitually operating a motor vehicle under the influence of an intoxicant.
Title
Motor Vehicle; Under the Influence; Habitual Offender
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-01-26 | House | Referred to TRN, JUD, referral sheet 1 |
2015-01-23 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
2015-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB225 (Same As) 2015-04-21 - Act 011, 4/21/2015 (Gov. Msg. No. 1111).
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=161&year=2015 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2015/bills/HB161_.HTM |