HI SB225 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-21 - Act 011, 4/21/2015 (Gov. Msg. No. 1111).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-21 - Act 011, 4/21/2015 (Gov. Msg. No. 1111).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the offense of habitually operating a vehicle under the influence of an intoxicant to include operating a vehicle under the influence of an intoxicant after at least one conviction within the previous ten years for habitually operating a motor vehicle under the influence of an intoxicant. (SD1)
Title
Motor Vehicle; Under the Influence; Habitual Offender
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-21 | Senate | Act 011, 4/21/2015 (Gov. Msg. No. 1111). |
2015-04-21 | House | Act 011, on 4/21/2015 (Gov. Msg. No. 1111). |
2015-04-10 | Senate | Enrolled to Governor. |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 355). |
2015-04-08 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Oshiro, Ward excused (2). Transmitted to Senate. |
2015-04-08 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1378), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2015-04-02 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, San Buenaventura, Brower, Creagan, Hashem, C. Lee, Morikawa, Nakashima, Takayama, Woodson, McDermott, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Kawakami. |
2015-03-30 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Thursday, 04-02-15 2:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2015-03-25 | House | Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Ing, Luke excused (2). |
2015-03-25 | House | Reported from TRN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1096), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. |
2015-03-23 | House | The committees on TRN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Aquino, LoPresti, Ichiyama, Johanson, Keohokalole, Takayama, Takumi, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) San Buenaventura; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Har, Nakashima, Tupola. |
2015-03-20 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by TRN on Monday, 03-23-15 11:00AM in House conference room 309. |
2015-03-12 | House | Referred to TRN, JUD, referral sheet 30 |
2015-03-10 | House | Pass First Reading |
2015-03-06 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 29) in amended form (SD 1). |
2015-03-06 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Kouchi). Transmitted to House. |
2015-03-05 | Senate | One Day Notice 03-06-15. |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 583) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading. |
2015-02-18 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDL were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Shimabukuro, Espero, Ihara, L. Thielen, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard. |
2015-02-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL will hold a public decision making on 02-18-15 9:15AM in conference room 016. |
2015-02-06 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDL. |
2015-02-06 | Senate | Reported from TRA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 30) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDL. |
2015-02-03 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TRA were as follows: 8 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Harimoto, Dela Cruz, English, Espero, Inouye, Kouchi, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Kidani. |
2015-01-30 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRA has scheduled a public hearing on 02-03-15 2:45PM in conference room 229. |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Referred to TRA, JDL. |
2015-01-23 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2015-01-23 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB161 (Same As) 2015-01-26 - Referred to TRN, JUD, referral sheet 1