HI HB1604 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-04 - The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-04 - The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the 2022 illegal fireworks task force within the department of the attorney general to develop a comprehensive strategic plan to stop the importation of illegal fireworks and explosives into the State, promote compliance with the fireworks control law; and ensure the safety and security of airports, harbors, and other facilities and institutions in the State against the discharge of illegal fireworks and explosives. Requires a report to the legislature.
Title
Relating To Fireworks.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-04 | House | The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2022-02-03 | House | Re-referred to CPC, JHA, referral sheet 8 |
2022-02-02 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Friday, 02-04-22 2:00PM in House conference room 329 Via Videoconference. |
2022-01-26 | House | Referred to CPC, referral sheet 2 |
2022-01-21 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2022-01-20 | House | Pending introduction. |
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1604&year=2022 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2022/bills/HB1604_.HTM |