HI HB160 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 14 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-12-18 - Carried over to 2014 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 14 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-12-18 - Carried over to 2014 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Makes permanent provisions relating to residency requirements for the burial in veterans cemeteries of armed service members and their dependents.
Title
Armed Services; Veterans; Burial
Sponsors
Rep. Mark Takai [D] | Rep. Ken Ito [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-12-18 | Carried over to 2014 Regular Session. | |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Referred to PSM, WAM. |
2013-02-15 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2013-02-15 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 17). |
2013-02-14 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Har, Tokioka excused (2). Transmitted to Senate. |
2013-02-13 | House | Passed Second Reading; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Coffman, Har, Say excused (3). |
2013-02-13 | House | Reported from VMI (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 408), recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2013-02-06 | House | The committees on VMI recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Takai, Ito, Choy, Ohno, Onishi, Takayama, Tsuji; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Brower, Cachola, McDermott. |
2013-02-01 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by VMI on Wednesday, 02-06-13 8:30AM in House conference room 312. |
2013-02-01 | House | Re-referred to VMI, referral sheet 11 |
2013-01-22 | House | Referred to VMI, FIN, referral sheet 2 |
2013-01-18 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
2013-01-17 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB540 (Same As)
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=160&year=2014 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2014/Bills/HB160_.HTM |