HI HB1595 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-3)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-22 - The committee on EET deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-22 - The committee on EET deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the Remote Testimony Task Force (Task Force) to develop procedures to allow the public to submit testimony remotely via the Internet during legislative proceedings. Requires the Task Force to report to the Legislature prior to the 2017 Regular Session. (HB1595 HD2)
Title
Legislative Testimony; Remote Testimony Task Force; Establishment
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-22 | Senate | The committee on EET deferred the measure. |
2016-03-22 | Senate | The committee on GVO deferred the measure. |
2016-03-18 | Senate | The committee(s) on GVO/EET has scheduled a public hearing on 03-22-16 1:15PM in conference room 414. |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Referred to GVO/EET, WAM. |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 198). |
2016-03-08 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2016-03-04 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-08-16. |
2016-03-04 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 901-16) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2016-02-24 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Cachola, Cullen, DeCoite, Johanson, Jordan, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, Onishi, Tokioka, Yamashita, Pouha; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ward. |
2016-02-22 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 02-24-16 2:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2016-02-19 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Nakashima, Thielen, Tokioka excused (3). |
2016-02-19 | House | Reported from LMG (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 485-16) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2016-02-17 | House | The committees on LMG recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Nishimoto, Mizuno, Evans, Saiki, Fukumoto Chang; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2016-02-12 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by LMG on Wednesday, 02-17-16 2:00PM in House conference room 423. |
2016-01-25 | House | Referred to LMG, FIN, referral sheet 1 |
2016-01-20 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2016-01-15 | House | Prefiled. |