CO HB1304 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 18 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Senate Committee on Local Government & Housing Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 18 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Senate Committee on Local Government & Housing Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning parking requirements within metropolitan planning organizations.
Title
Minimum Parking Requirements
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-25 - Senate - Senate Local Government & Housing: Refer House Bill 24-1304 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-17 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 35 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-04-16 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (h.002) (Y: 18 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2024-04-12 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 24-1304, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-12 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment L.008 (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-05 - House - House Transportation, Housing & Local Government: Refer House Bill 24-1304, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-05 - House - House Transportation, Housing & Local Government: Adopt amendment L.005 (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-05 - House - House Transportation, Housing & Local Government: Adopt amendment L.004 (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-05 - House - House Transportation, Housing & Local Government: Adopt amendment L.002 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-05 - House - House Transportation, Housing & Local Government: Refer House Bill 24-1304, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-17 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 35 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-04-16 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (h.002) (Y: 18 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2024-04-12 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 24-1304, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-12 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment L.008 (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-05 - House - House Transportation, Housing & Local Government: Refer House Bill 24-1304, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-05 - House - House Transportation, Housing & Local Government: Adopt amendment L.005 (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-05 - House - House Transportation, Housing & Local Government: Adopt amendment L.004 (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-05 - House - House Transportation, Housing & Local Government: Adopt amendment L.002 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-05 - House - House Transportation, Housing & Local Government: Refer House Bill 24-1304, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-25 | Senate | Senate Committee on Local Government & Housing Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2024-04-18 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Local Government & Housing |
2024-04-17 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2024-04-16 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2024-04-15 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2024-04-12 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2024-03-05 | House | House Committee on Transportation, Housing & Local Government Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2024-02-14 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Transportation, Housing & Local Government |