HI HB159 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB159
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 24 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-06-24 - Act 058, 06/21/2024 (Gov. Msg. No. 1159).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 24 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-06-24 - Act 058, 06/21/2024 (Gov. Msg. No. 1159).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Exempts the notarization requirement for renewals of liquor licenses. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Liquor Licenses.
Sponsors
Rep. Chris Todd [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-02-13 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, Unamended (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-15 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Consumer Protection: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-15 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Consumer Protection: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-24 | Senate | Act 058, 06/21/2024 (Gov. Msg. No. 1159). |
2024-06-24 | House | Act 058, on 06/21/2024 (Gov. Msg. No. 1159). |
2024-04-19 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2024-04-22 | Senate | Received notice of House agreement and passage on Final Reading (Hse. Com. No. 782). |
2024-04-19 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in SD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cochran, Garcia excused (2). |
2024-04-18 | House | House agrees to Senate amendment(s). |
2024-04-19 | Senate | Received notice of House reconsideration of action in disagreeing to the amendments proposed by the Senate (Hse. Com. No. 769). |
2024-04-18 | House | Reconsideration of action taken on 03-11-24. |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 454). |
2024-03-11 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2024-03-08 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 339) in amended form (SD 1). |
2024-03-08 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 20; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 5 (Senator(s) Fukunaga, Ihara, Keohokalole, Kidani, Lee). Transmitted to House. |
2024-03-07 | Senate | One Day Notice 03-08-24. |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3061) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading. |
2024-02-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDC were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Elefante, San Buenaventura, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard. |
2024-02-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 02-13-24 10:00AM; Conference Room 016 & Videoconference. |
2023-12-11 | Carried over to 2024 Regular Session. | |
2023-03-24 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC. |
2023-03-24 | Senate | Reported from CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1366) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC. |
2023-03-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keohokalole, McKelvey, Richards, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fukunaga. |
2023-03-10 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 03-15-23 10:00AM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference. |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Referred to CPN, JDC. |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 135). |
2023-03-03 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Alcos, Matayoshi excused (2). Transmitted to Senate. |
2023-03-03 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 995), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2023-02-27 | House | The committee on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamashita, Kitagawa, Aiu, Chun, Cochran, Garrett, Kahaloa, Kila, Kobayashi, Lamosao, Morikawa, Poepoe, Takenouchi, Alcos, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Nishimoto. |
2023-02-24 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Monday, 02-27-23 11:30AM in House conference room 308 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2023-02-15 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2023-02-15 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 486) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2023-02-09 | House | The committee on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Sayama, Amato, Belatti, Hashem, Hussey-Burdick, Gates, Lowen, Onishi, Tam, Pierick; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2023-02-06 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Thursday, 02-09-23 2:00PM in House conference room 329 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2023-01-25 | House | Referred to CPC, FIN, referral sheet 1 |
2023-01-19 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2023-01-17 | House | Prefiled. |
Same As/Similar To
HB159 (Carry Over) 2023-03-24 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC.