HI HB1584 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-24 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-24 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Updates the list of federal agencies whose law enforcement officers may make arrests for certain offenses under state law by adding United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement-Homeland Security Investigations and deleting United States Citizenship and Immigration Services from the list. Updates references to the titles of the heads of the district offices for the listed federal agencies and the names of these agencies, including United States Customs and Border Protection. (SD1)
Title
Relating To The Power Of Arrest.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-22 - Senate - Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-15 - Senate - Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - House - House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, Unamended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-15 - Senate - Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - House - House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, Unamended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-24 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC. |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Reported from PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3402) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC. |
2022-03-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PSM were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, DeCoite, Baker; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Riviere, Fevella. |
2022-03-18 | Senate | The committee on PSM will reconsider its previous decision on 03-15-22 and will hold a public decision making on 03-22-22 1:00PM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference. |
2022-03-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PSM were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, DeCoite, Baker, Riviere, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2022-03-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 03-15-22 1:00PM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference. |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Referred to PSM, JDC. |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 125). |
2022-03-04 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Ganaden, Kapela, Perruso, Wildberger voting no (4) and Representative(s) Matayoshi, McDermott, Nakashima excused (3). Transmitted to Senate. |
2022-03-03 | House | Passed Second Reading; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Matayoshi, McDermott, Todd excused (3). |
2022-03-03 | House | Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 796-22), recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2022-02-01 | House | The committees on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Matayoshi, Ichiyama, D. Kobayashi, Lowen, McKelvey, Nakamura, Takumi, Todd, Tokioka, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) LoPresti. |
2022-01-27 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Tuesday, 02-01-22 2:00PM in House conference room Via Videoconference. |
2022-01-26 | House | Referred to JHA, referral sheet 1 |
2022-01-21 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2022-01-20 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2780 (Same As) 2022-04-27 - Act 013, 04/27/2022 (Gov. Msg. No. 1113).
Subjects
Customs and Border Protection
Federal Agencies
Immigration and Customs Enforcement-Homeland Security Investigations
Power of Arrest
Federal Agencies
Immigration and Customs Enforcement-Homeland Security Investigations
Power of Arrest