HI HB1573 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-17 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-17 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Clarifies county zoning authority by distinguishing single-family residential use from single-family vacation rental use and allowing amortization by ordinance for single-family transient vacation rentals over a reasonable period. (HB1573 HD1)
Title
Kauai County Package; County Zoning; Single-Family Transient Vacation Rentals
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-17 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2016-02-17 | House | Reported from WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 379-16) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2016-02-12 | House | The committees on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Cullen, Evans, Ing, C. Lee, Lowen, Nishimoto, Say, Pouha, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2016-02-09 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by WAL on Friday, 02-12-16 9:30AM in House conference room 325. |
2016-01-25 | House | Referred to WAL, FIN, referral sheet 1 |
2016-01-20 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2016-01-15 | House | Prefiled. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2033 (Same As) 2016-01-20 - Referred to TSI/PSM, CPH/WAM.