HI HB155 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Allows the department of human services to adopt rules to implement a standardized set of procedures accommodating complaints and grievances against infant and toddler child care centers. Allows the department to publicize procedures, including on its website. (HB155 HD1)
Title
Infant and Toddler Child Care; Complaint & Grievance Policy
Sponsors
Rep. Mark Takai [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-11 | Carried over to 2010 Regular Session. | |
2009-02-09 | (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting no (0) and Carroll, Chang, Takai excused (3). | |
2009-02-06 | (H) Reported from HUS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 79) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. | |
2009-02-05 | (H) The committees on HUS recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, Brower, Bertram, Nishimoto, Shimabukuro, Yamane; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Carroll, Ward. | |
2009-02-02 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by HUS on Thursday, 02-05-09 8:15 AM in House conference room 329. | |
2009-02-02 | (H) Re-referred to HUS, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 6 | |
2009-01-26 | (H) Referred to HUS, JUD, referral sheet 2 | |
2009-01-23 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2009-01-22 | (H) Pending introduction. |