HI HB1549 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1549
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-17 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Tokioka excused (2).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-17 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Tokioka excused (2).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that a county shall not impose an inclusionary zoning requirement on a housing development offered exclusively for sale to buyers earning 120% or less of the area median income. (HB1549 HD1)
Title
Relating To Inclusionary Zoning.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-17 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Tokioka excused (2). |
2017-02-17 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 608), recommending referral to FIN. |
2017-02-14 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Nishimoto, San Buenaventura, Belatti, Brower, Johanson, C. Lee, Morikawa, Nakashima, Oshiro, McDermott, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2017-02-10 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Tuesday, 02-14-17 2:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2017-02-10 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Gates, Ing excused (2). |
2017-02-10 | House | Reported from HSG (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 174) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. |
2017-02-07 | House | The committees on HSG recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Brower, Aquino, Hashem, Quinlan, San Buenaventura, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Nakamura; and Excused: none. |
2017-02-01 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HSG on Tuesday, 02-07-17 9:00AM in House conference room 423. |
2017-01-30 | House | Referred to HSG, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 6 |
2017-01-25 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1549 (Carry Over) 2017-02-17 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Tokioka excused (2).