HI HB1541 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1541
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-09 - Referred to GVO, WAM.
Pending: Senate Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-09 - Referred to GVO, WAM.
Pending: Senate Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Specifies that the legislative allowance for Oahu-based members' required travel within the State shall be equal to the federal Department of Defense flat rate per diem amount for temporary duty of the same duration in the applicable locality.
Title
Relating To Legislative Allowance For Expenses While Traveling Within The State.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-09 | Senate | Referred to GVO, WAM. |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 203). |
2017-03-03 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ichiyama, McDermott excused (2). Transmitted to Senate. |
2017-03-02 | House | Passed Second Reading; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ichiyama excused (1). |
2017-03-02 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 830), recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2017-02-09 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 17 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Cachola, Choy, DeCoite, Gates, Holt, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, Nakamura, Tokioka, Quinlan, Yamashita, Tupola, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2017-02-06 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 02-09-17 2:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2017-01-30 | House | Referred to FIN, referral sheet 6 |
2017-01-25 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1541 (Carry Over) 2017-03-09 - Referred to GVO, WAM.
SB1175 (Same As) 2017-01-27 - Referred to GVO, WAM.
SB1175 (Same As) 2017-01-27 - Referred to GVO, WAM.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1541&year=2017 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2017/bills/HB1541_.HTM |