HI HB1536 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1536
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-27 - The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-27 - The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that wage disclosure, discussion, inquiry, and other prohibition provisions under section 378-2.3, HRS, do not apply to discussion of other employee wages if knowledge of the wages stem from human resources, payroll, or legal professional responsibilities in the workplace. (HB1536 HD1)
Title
Relating To Equal Pay.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-27 | House | The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2019-02-26 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-27-19 2:00PM in conference room 325. |
2019-02-26 | House | The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-27-19. |
2019-02-22 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Tuesday, 02-26-19 2:05PM in House conference room 325. |
2019-02-15 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Nakamura, Quinlan, Thielen excused (5). |
2019-02-15 | House | Reported from LAB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 698) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. |
2019-02-07 | House | The committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Eli, Ichiyama, Kitagawa, McKelvey, Yamashita, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Quinlan. |
2019-02-04 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by LAB on Thursday, 02-07-19 9:30AM in House conference room 309. |
2019-01-28 | House | Referred to LAB, JUD, referral sheet 6 |
2019-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1536 (Carry Over) 2019-02-27 - The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.