HI HB1528 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-05 - Referred to CPH, WAM.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Repeals the existing statutory requirement that $2,000,000 of certain taxes collected on bank and financial corporations be deposited to the compliance resolution fund. Requires adjustments to fees and assessments collected by the Division of Financial Institutions based on the amount of moneys credited to the division in the compliance resolution fund. Establishes criteria to determine the amounts to be assessed for fees and expenses regulated under title 25, HRS. Provides for the reduction or cessation of fees or interest paid into the mortgage loan recovery fund, contractors recovery fund, contractors education fund, real estate recovery fund, real estate education fund, and condominium education fund if the balance in the funds attain a certain dollar amount. Sets the annual fee assessed on cable operators at 4.5% of the income received from subscribers for cable services rendered during the preceding calendar year. Authorizes the Director of the Department of Commerce and Consumer Affairs to reduce the fee if the amount exceeds the amount necessary to administer chapter 440G, HRS. (HB1528 HD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Commerce And Consumer Affairs.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-05SenateReferred to CPH, WAM.
2019-03-01SenatePassed First Reading.
2019-03-01SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 127).
2019-02-28HousePassed Third Reading with Representative(s) Okimoto voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
2019-02-28HouseReported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 902), recommending passage on Third Reading.
2019-02-20HouseThe committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Gates, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Wildberger, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 6 Excused: Representative(s) Eli, Hashimoto, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Todd, McDermott.
2019-02-15HouseBill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 02-20-19 4:00PM in House conference room 308.
2019-02-15HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Nakamura, Quinlan, Thielen excused (5).
2019-02-15HouseReported from IAC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 653) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
2019-02-14HouseThe committees on IAC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Ohno, D. Kobayashi, Gates, Kong, Nishimoto, Takayama, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
2019-02-12HouseBill scheduled for decision making on Thursday, 02-14-19 11:30AM in conference room 430.
2019-02-12HouseThe committee(s) on IAC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-14-19 at 11:30am.
2019-02-08HouseBill scheduled to be heard by IAC on Tuesday, 02-12-19 9:45AM in House conference room 430.
2019-02-01HouseRe-referred to IAC, FIN, referral sheet 11
2019-01-28HouseReferred to IAC, CPC/JUD, FIN, referral sheet 6
2019-01-24HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback