HI HB1528 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1528
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Repeals the existing statutory requirement that $2,000,000 of certain taxes collected on bank and financial corporations be deposited to the compliance resolution fund. Requires adjustments to fees and assessments collected by the Division of Financial Institutions based on the amount of moneys credited to the division in the compliance resolution fund. Establishes criteria to determine the amounts to be assessed for fees and expenses regulated under title 25, HRS. Provides for the reduction or cessation of fees or interest paid into the mortgage loan recovery fund, contractors recovery fund, contractors education fund, real estate recovery fund, real estate education fund, and condominium education fund if the balance in the funds attain a certain dollar amount. Sets the annual fee assessed on cable operators at 4.5% of the income received from subscribers for cable services rendered during the preceding calendar year. Authorizes the Director of the Department of Commerce and Consumer Affairs to reduce the fee if the amount exceeds the amount necessary to administer chapter 440G, HRS. (HB1528 HD1)
Title
Relating To Commerce And Consumer Affairs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-20 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - House - House Intrastate Commerce: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - House - House Intrastate Commerce: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-01 | Carried over to 2020 Regular Session. | |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Referred to CPH, WAM. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 127). |
2019-02-28 | House | Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) Okimoto voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2019-02-28 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 902), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2019-02-20 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Gates, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Wildberger, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 6 Excused: Representative(s) Eli, Hashimoto, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Todd, McDermott. |
2019-02-15 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 02-20-19 4:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2019-02-15 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Nakamura, Quinlan, Thielen excused (5). |
2019-02-15 | House | Reported from IAC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 653) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2019-02-14 | House | The committees on IAC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Ohno, D. Kobayashi, Gates, Kong, Nishimoto, Takayama, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2019-02-12 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Thursday, 02-14-19 11:30AM in conference room 430. |
2019-02-12 | House | The committee(s) on IAC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-14-19 at 11:30am. |
2019-02-08 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by IAC on Tuesday, 02-12-19 9:45AM in House conference room 430. |
2019-02-01 | House | Re-referred to IAC, FIN, referral sheet 11 |
2019-01-28 | House | Referred to IAC, CPC/JUD, FIN, referral sheet 6 |
2019-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1528 (Carry Over) 2019-03-05 - Referred to CPH, WAM.