HI HB1501 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1501
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-01 - The committee(s) on WLH recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Water, Land, & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-01 - The committee(s) on WLH recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Water, Land, & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates moneys for the acquisition of Molokai Ranch. Requires that lands acquired pursuant to this Act be held in the public land trust.
Title
Relating To Molokai Ranch.
Sponsors
Rep. Richard Creagan [D] | Rep. Rida Cabanilla Arakawa [D] | Rep. Cynthia Thielen [R] | Rep. Chris Todd [D] |
Rep. Tina Wildberger [D] | Rep. Romy Cachola [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-01 | House | The committee(s) on WLH recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2019-01-30 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by WLH on Friday, 02-01-19 9:00AM in House conference room 325. |
2019-01-28 | House | Referred to WLH, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 6 |
2019-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1501 (Carry Over) 2019-02-01 - The committee(s) on WLH recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1501&year=2019 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2019/bills/HB1501_.HTM |