HI HB1500 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-01-31 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with Representative(s) Fukumoto, Hanohano, Johanson, Jordan, Matsumoto, McDermott, McKelvey voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Thielen voting no (1) and Representative(s) Say excused (1).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 15 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-01-31 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with Representative(s) Fukumoto, Hanohano, Johanson, Jordan, Matsumoto, McDermott, McKelvey voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Thielen voting no (1) and Representative(s) Say excused (1).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Allows general engineering contractors and general building contractors to perform work subordinate to but necessary for completion of the project and for which the contractors do not have a license, if the value of the work performed is equal to or less than one percent of the total contract price. (HB1500 HD1)
Title
Contractors
Sponsors
Sen. Karl Rhoads [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-31 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with Representative(s) Fukumoto, Hanohano, Johanson, Jordan, Matsumoto, McDermott, McKelvey voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Thielen voting no (1) and Representative(s) Say excused (1). |
2014-01-31 | House | Reported from LAB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 53-14) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. |
2014-01-28 | House | The committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Ichiyama; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Yamashita, Aquino, Takayama, Takumi; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Har, Ing, Yamane, Johanson. |
2014-01-24 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by LAB on Tuesday, 01-28-14 8:45AM in House conference room 309. |
2014-01-15 | House | Referred to LAB, CPC, referral sheet 1 |
2014-01-15 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
2014-01-08 | House | Prefiled |