HI HB1488 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the procedures for a farmer or landowner to petition the land use commission for an important agricultural land designation by deleting provisions: allowing petitioner to seek reclassification of other lands within the same petition; providing criteria for the petition for declaratory order; requiring petition to submit a certification as to the quality of the land; relating to the commission's evaluation and decision making, allowing a petitioner to earn credits, and requiring prior legislative authorization for redesignation of important agricultural lands.
Title
Important Agricultural Lands
Sponsors
Rep. Della au Belatti [D] | Rep. Mele Carroll [D] | Rep. Cindy Evans [D] | Rep. Faye Hanohano [D] |
Rep. Marilyn Lee [D] | Rep. Sylvia Luke [D] | Rep. Scott Nishimoto [D] | Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-11 | Carried over to 2010 Regular Session. | |
2009-01-30 | (H) Referred to WLO/AGR, JUD, referral sheet 4 | |
2009-01-28 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2009-01-27 | (H) Pending introduction. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://capitol.hawaii.gov/Archives/measure_indiv_Archives.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1488&year=2010 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2010/Bills/HB1488_.HTM |