HI HB1478 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1478
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 11 2017 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-25 - Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Wednesday 04-26-17 10:00AM in conference room 309.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on April 11 2017 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-25 - Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Wednesday 04-26-17 10:00AM in conference room 309.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates funds to advocate, promote, develop, test, and evaluate unmanned aerial system technologies. Effective 7/1/2030. (SD1)
Title
Making An Appropriation For Unmanned Aerial System Technologies.
Sponsors
Rep. Mark Nakashima [D] | Rep. Cindy Evans [D] | Rep. Daniel Holt [D] | Rep. Richard Onishi [D] |
Rep. Roy Takumi [D] | Rep. Kyle Yamashita [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-25 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Wednesday 04-26-17 10:00AM in conference room 309. |
2017-04-24 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Tuesday, 04-25-17 10:00AM in conference room 309. |
2017-04-18 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 680). |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Wakai Chair; K. Kahele, Taniguchi Co-Chairs. |
2017-04-17 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 586). |
2017-04-17 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 585). |
2017-04-17 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Keohokalole Chair; McKelvey, Nakashima, Tupola. |
2017-04-13 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2017-04-11 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 660) in amended form (SD 1). |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2017-04-07 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-11-17. |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1518) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2017-04-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Dela Cruz, English, Galuteria, Harimoto, Inouye, K. Kahele, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Wakai. |
2017-04-03 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-05-17 9:30AM in conference room 211. |
2017-03-24 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. |
2017-03-24 | Senate | Reported from ETT/HRE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1104) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. |
2017-03-17 | Senate | The committee(s) on HRE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HRE were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Kahele, Kidani, Espero, Taniguchi; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Keith-Agaran. |
2017-03-17 | Senate | The committee(s) on ETT recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in ETT were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Taniguchi, Baker; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Galuteria, L. Thielen. |
2017-03-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on ETT/HRE has scheduled a public hearing on 03-17-17 1:30PM in conference room 414. |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Referred to ETT/HRE, WAM. |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 356). |
2017-03-07 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ichiyama excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2017-03-03 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ichiyama, McDermott, Nakashima excused (3). |
2017-03-03 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 834) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2017-02-28 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Cachola, Choy, Gates, Holt, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, Nakamura, Tokioka, Quinlan, Yamashita, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) DeCoite, Tupola. |
2017-02-24 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 02-28-17 11:00AM in House conference room 308. |
2017-02-22 | House | Re-referred to FIN, referral sheet 23 |
2017-01-30 | House | Referred to TRN, FIN, referral sheet 6 |
2017-01-25 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1478 (Carry Over) 2017-04-25 - Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Wednesday 04-26-17 10:00AM in conference room 309.