HI HB1476 | 2012 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-12-01 - Carried over to 2012 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Mandates minors aged fifteen to seventeen be tried as adults in cases of first degree murder when no other offenses are charged. Provides for discretionary remand of the minor to the family court in specified cases. Effective July 1, 2050. (HB1476 HD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Crime; Minors Tried as Adults

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2011-12-01 Carried over to 2012 Regular Session.
2011-02-08 (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
2011-02-08 (H) Reported from HUS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 117) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD.
2011-02-03 (H) The committees on HUS recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, Jordan, Morikawa, Yamane, Ching, Pine; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Hanohano, C. Lee, Wooley; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti.
2011-01-31 (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by HUS on Thursday, 02-03-11 9:00AM in House conference room 329.
2011-01-28 (H) Referred to HUS, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 3
2011-01-26 (H) Introduced and Passed First Reading

Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback