HI HB1473 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-4)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Repeals requirement of providing full social security number on application to register to vote, requiring instead, the last four digits of a social security number, a Hawaii driver's license number, or a Hawaii state identification card number.
Title
Voter Registration; Social Security Number
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-11 | Carried over to 2010 Regular Session. | |
2009-01-30 | (H) Referred to JUD, referral sheet 4 | |
2009-01-28 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2009-01-27 | (H) Pending introduction. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://capitol.hawaii.gov/Archives/measure_indiv_Archives.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1473&year=2010 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2010/Bills/HB1473_.HTM |