HI HB1462 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1462
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the State Auditor to study the feasibility of providing health benefits to state and county employees using a self-insured model. Appropriates funds. Establishes the Rate Stabilization Reserve Fund. Caps employer contributions to the Other Post-Employment Benefits Trust Fund. Provides for the use of a portion of TAT revenues to supplement deficient county public employer contribution amounts. (HB1462 HD1)
Title
Relating To Unfunded Liabilities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-27 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - House - House Labor & Public Employment: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - House - House Labor & Public Employment: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-01 | Carried over to 2020 Regular Session. | |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Referred to GVO/LCA, WAM. |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 307). |
2019-03-01 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2019-03-01 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1120), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2019-02-27 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Holt, Kitagawa, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Todd, Wildberger, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) B. Kobayashi; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott. |
2019-02-25 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 02-27-19 11:00AM in House conference room 308. |
2019-02-20 | House | Re-referred to LAB, FIN, referral sheet 25 |
2019-02-08 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, Nakamura, Thielen excused (3). |
2019-02-08 | House | Reported from LAB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 156) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. |
2019-02-05 | House | The committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Eli, Ichiyama, Kitagawa, McKelvey, Yamashita, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Quinlan. |
2019-02-01 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by LAB on Tuesday, 02-05-19 9:30AM in House conference room 309. |
2019-01-31 | House | Re-referred to LAB, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 9 |
2019-01-28 | House | Referred to LAB/LMG, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 6 |
2019-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1462 (Carry Over) 2019-03-05 - Referred to GVO/LCA, WAM.