HI HB1440 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-29 - Act 139, 06/25/2015 (Gov. Msg. No. 1239).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-29 - Act 139, 06/25/2015 (Gov. Msg. No. 1239).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates funds for the Hawaii Keiki: Healthy and Ready to Learn Program. Requires matching funds. (HB1440 CD1)
Title
Hawaii Keiki: Healthy and Ready to Learn; Department of Education; Appropriation; Matching Funds ($)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-29 | Senate | Act 139, 06/25/2015 (Gov. Msg. No. 1239). |
2015-06-29 | House | Act 139, on 06/25/2015 (Gov. Msg. No. 1239). |
2015-05-06 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2015-05-07 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 680). |
2015-05-05 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 699). |
2015-05-05 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Tsuji excused (1). |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 25 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2015-05-01 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-05-15. |
2015-05-01 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 115). |
2015-05-01 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 05-05-15. |
2015-05-01 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 115) as amended in (CD 1). |
2015-05-01 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, Green, Kouchi; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Harimoto, Slom. |
2015-05-01 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, Nishimoto, Morikawa, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2015-04-30 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 05-01-15 1:05PM in conference room 329. |
2015-04-28 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-30-15 1:45PM in conference room 329. |
2015-04-24 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Tuesday, 04-28-15 1:45PM in conference room 329. |
2015-04-23 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 660). |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Kidani Chair; Green, Harimoto Co-Chairs; Kouchi, Slom. |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 617). |
2015-04-20 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Belatti, Nishimoto Co-Chairs; Morikawa, Matsumoto. |
2015-04-17 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 616). |
2015-04-16 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2015-04-14 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 629) in amended form (SD 1). |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2015-04-10 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-14-15. |
2015-04-10 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1556) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2015-04-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 9 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Kouchi, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, English, Harimoto, Inouye, Riviere, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Galuteria, Ruderman. |
2015-03-31 | Senate | The committee on WAM will reconsider its previous decision made on 3/31/15 and will hold a public decision making on 04-02-15 10:30AM in conference room 211. |
2015-03-31 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 8 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Kouchi, Chun Oakland, English, Harimoto, Inouye, Riviere, Ruderman; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Galuteria, Slom. |
2015-03-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-31-15 9:00AM in conference room 211. |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Reported from EDU/HTH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1007) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. |
2015-03-20 | Senate | The committee(s) on HTH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HTH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Green, Wakai, Baker, Gabbard, Ruderman; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Riviere, Slom. |
2015-03-20 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in EDU were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, Harimoto, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, Nishihara, L. Thielen, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Kouchi. |
2015-03-18 | Senate | The committee(s) on HTH deferred the measure until 03-20-15 1:30PM in conference room 414. |
2015-03-18 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU deferred the measure until 03-20-15 1:30PM in conference room 229. |
2015-03-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU/HTH has scheduled a public hearing on 03-18-15 1:15PM in conference room 229. |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Referred to EDU/HTH, WAM. |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 132). |
2015-03-06 | House | Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) Cachola voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2015-03-06 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 722), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2015-02-27 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Cullen, DeCoite, Johanson, Jordan, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, Lowen, Onishi, Yamashita, Pouha; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Cachola; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Tokioka, Ward. |
2015-02-24 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 02-27-15 11:00AM in House conference room 308. |
2015-02-18 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Pouha excused (1). |
2015-02-18 | House | Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 343) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2015-02-11 | House | The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, Creagan, Jordan, Kobayashi, Morikawa, Fukumoto Chang, Tupola; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Hashem, Oshiro. |
2015-02-09 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Wednesday, 02-11-15 8:35AM in House conference room 329. |
2015-02-02 | House | Referred to HLT, FIN, referral sheet 6 |
2015-01-29 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB1311 (Same As) 2015-02-02 - Referred to EDU/HTH, WAM.