HI HB1434 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1434
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-10 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Gates, Ing excused (2).
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-10 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Gates, Ing excused (2).
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires employers of twenty-five or more food establishment workers to provide the workers with paid time off for illness, treatment, and preventive medical care of the worker and the worker's spouse, children, parents, and grandparents and for treatment arising from domestic violence or sexual assault. (HB1434 HD1)
Title
Relating To Labor.
Sponsors
Rep. Aaron Johanson [D] | Rep. Della au Belatti [D] | Sen. Chris Lee [D] | Rep. Sylvia Luke [D] |
Rep. Mark Nakashima [D] | Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-10 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Gates, Ing excused (2). |
2017-02-10 | House | Reported from LAB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 211) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. |
2017-02-07 | House | The committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Holt, Keohokalole, Nakashima, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Takumi; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Matsumoto. |
2017-02-03 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by LAB on Tuesday, 02-07-17 9:00AM in House conference room 309. |
2017-01-30 | House | Referred to LAB, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 6 |
2017-01-25 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1434 (Carry Over) 2017-02-10 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Gates, Ing excused (2).