HI HB1432 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-12-18 - Carried over to 2014 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-12-18 - Carried over to 2014 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates funds to support a statewide aging and disability resource center with sites in each county. Effective July 1, 2050. (HB1432 HD1)
Title
Aging and Disability Resource Centers; Appropriation ($)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-12-18 | Carried over to 2014 Regular Session. | |
2013-03-22 | Senate | The committee on WAM deferred the measure. |
2013-03-18 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-22-13 9:00AM in conference room 211. |
2013-03-18 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. |
2013-03-18 | Senate | Reported from HMS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 883) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. |
2013-03-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HMS were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Green, Taniguchi; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Kidani, Slom. |
2013-03-06 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS has scheduled a public hearing on 03-12-13 1:25PM in conference room 016. |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Referred to HMS, WAM. |
2013-03-01 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2013-03-01 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 139). |
2013-02-28 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Coffman, McDermott excused (2). Transmitted to Senate. |
2013-02-28 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 676), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2013-02-20 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 16 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Johanson, Cullen, Hashem, Ing, Jordan, Lowen, Morikawa, Onishi, Takayama, Tokioka, Woodson, Yamashita, Fukumoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Kobayashi. |
2013-02-17 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 02-20-13 2:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2013-02-15 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Carroll, Coffman, Hanohano, Har, Kawakami, Ward excused (6). |
2013-02-15 | House | Reported from HLT/HUS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 479) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2013-02-12 | House | The committees on HUS recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Carroll, Kobayashi, Belatti, Cabanilla, Jordan, Morikawa, Woodson, Fukumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2013-02-12 | House | The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, Morikawa, Cabanilla, Carroll, Jordan, Kobayashi, Woodson, Cheape; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2013-02-05 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT/HUS on Tuesday, 02-12-13 11:00AM in House conference room 329. |
2013-01-28 | House | Referred to HLT/HUS, FIN, referral sheet 7 |
2013-01-24 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |