HI HB143 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB143
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-19 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Har, Kong, Matayoshi excused (3).
Pending: House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-19 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Har, Kong, Matayoshi excused (3).
Pending: House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Clarifies that candidates do not need to file preliminary general reports if they are either unsuccessful or are elected to office in the primary election. Clarifies the aggregate contribution and expenditure amounts that trigger the requirement for a candidate or noncandidate committee to file only the final election period report. Effective 7/1/2112. (HD1)
Title
Relating To Reports Filed With The Campaign Spending Commission.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-02-17 - House - House Government Reform: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-19 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Har, Kong, Matayoshi excused (3). |
2021-02-19 | House | Reported from GVR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 529) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JHA. |
2021-02-17 | House | The committees on GVR recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Wildberger, Cullen, Eli, Ichiyama; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Mizuno, Woodson, Yamashita, Ward. |
2021-02-12 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-17-21 10:30AM in conference room 309 Via Videoconference. |
2021-02-12 | House | The committee(s) on GVR recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-17-21 at 10:30 am. |
2021-02-09 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by GVR on Friday, 02-12-21 10:00AM in House conference room 309 Via Videoconference. |
2021-01-27 | House | Referred to GVR, JHA, referral sheet 1 |
2021-01-22 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2021-01-21 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB143 (Carry Over) 2021-02-19 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Har, Kong, Matayoshi excused (3).
SB403 (Same As) 2021-04-19 - Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 559).
SB403 (Same As) 2021-04-19 - Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 559).
Subjects
Campaign Spending Commission Package
Candidate Committees
Committee Reports
Filing Dates
Noncandidate Committees
Candidate Committees
Committee Reports
Filing Dates
Noncandidate Committees