HI HB1416 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-12-18 - Carried over to 2014 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-12-18 - Carried over to 2014 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Clarifies that participation in a health wellness program does not constitute illegal gambling.
Title
Health Wellness Programs; Gambling
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-12-18 | Carried over to 2014 Regular Session. | |
2013-02-11 | House | The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2013-02-07 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Monday, 02-11-13 2:00PM in conference room 325. |
2013-02-06 | House | The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-11-13. |
2013-01-31 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Wednesday, 02-06-13 2:30PM in House conference room 325. |
2013-01-28 | House | Referred to CPC, JUD, referral sheet 7 |
2013-01-24 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1416&year=2014 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2014/Bills/HB1416_.HTM |