HI HB1415 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1415
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-09 - Referred to GVO, CPH.
Pending: Senate Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-09 - Referred to GVO, CPH.
Pending: Senate Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes additional performance bond requirements for surety companies and bond companies under the Hawaii Public Procurement Code. Establishes conditions for releasing or terminating the obligations of a payment bond. (HB1415 HD2)
Title
Relating To Procurement.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-09 | Senate | Referred to GVO, CPH. |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 348). |
2017-03-07 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ichiyama excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2017-03-03 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-07-17. |
2017-03-03 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1000) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2017-02-22 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Cachola, DeCoite, Gates, Holt, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, Nakamura, Quinlan, Yamashita, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Choy, Tokioka, Tupola. |
2017-02-18 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 02-22-17 3:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2017-02-07 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Oshiro excused (1). |
2017-02-07 | House | Reported from LAB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 79) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2017-02-02 | House | The committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Holt, Keohokalole, Nakashima, Takumi, Yamashita, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2017-01-30 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by LAB on Thursday, 02-02-17 9:00AM in House conference room 309. |
2017-01-30 | House | Referred to LAB, FIN, referral sheet 6 |
2017-01-25 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1415 (Carry Over) 2017-03-09 - Referred to GVO, CPH.
SB1280 (Same As) 2017-02-28 - The committee on CPH deferred the measure.
SB1280 (Same As) 2017-02-28 - The committee on CPH deferred the measure.