HI HB1406 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-15 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Carroll, Coffman, Hanohano, Har, Kawakami, Ward excused (6).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-15 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Carroll, Coffman, Hanohano, Har, Kawakami, Ward excused (6).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires homeowners, community, and condo associations and cooperatives to submit their duly adopted rules providing for the placement of solar energy devices by the due date of their next condominium association biennial registration. Provides for loss of tax exempt status for failure to comply. (HB1406 HD1)
Title
Solar Energy Devices; Association Rules
Sponsors
Sen. Chris Lee [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-15 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Carroll, Coffman, Hanohano, Har, Kawakami, Ward excused (6). |
2013-02-15 | House | Reported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 451) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. |
2013-02-12 | House | The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, Thielen, Coffman, Evans, Kawakami, Lowen; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Cullen, Hanohano, Fale; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2013-02-08 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP on Tuesday, 02-12-13 8:30AM in House conference room 325. |
2013-01-28 | House | Referred to EEP, CPC, referral sheet 7 |
2013-01-24 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |