HI HB1400 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-12 - The committee(s) on HUS recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-12 - The committee(s) on HUS recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the Department of Human Services to develop a farmers market matching incentive program for beneficiaries of the Supplemental Nutrition Assistance Program.
Title
SNAP; Farmers Markets; Matching Incentive Program ($)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-12 | House | The committee(s) on HUS recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2015-02-03 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HUS on Thursday, 02-12-15 10:00AM in House conference room 329. |
2015-02-02 | House | Referred to HUS, FIN, referral sheet 6 |
2015-01-29 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1400&year=2015 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2015/bills/HB1400_.HTM |