HI HB138 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB138
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-11 - Re-referred to HLT, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 19
Pending: House Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-11 - Re-referred to HLT, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 19
Pending: House Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires owners and operators of fifteen or more food service establishments to provide calorie information for menu items. (HB138 HD1)
Title
Relating To Health.
Sponsors
Rep. John Mizuno [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-11 | House | Re-referred to HLT, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 19 |
2019-02-04 | House | Recommitted to HLT as amended in HD 1 with none voting no and Representative(s) Quinlan, Say, Thielen, Tokioka excused. |
2019-02-04 | House | Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 41) as amended in HD 1, recommending recommittal to HLT for further consideration. |
2019-01-31 | House | The committee recommends that the measure pass with amendments, for recommittal for further consideration. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, B. Kobayashi, Belatti, Nakamura, Say, Ward; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) San Buenaventura; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Tokioka. |
2019-01-28 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Thursday, 01-31-19 11:25AM in conference room 329. |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to HLT, referral sheet 2 |
2019-01-18 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2019-01-17 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB138 (Carry Over) 2019-02-11 - Re-referred to HLT, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 19