HI HB1367 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-12-17 - Carried over to 2016 Regular Session.
Pending: House Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-12-17 - Carried over to 2016 Regular Session.
Pending: House Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Transfers title to certain parcels of land from the University of Hawaii to the Hawaii Housing Finance and Development Corporation for development of affordable housing and income generation for University of Hawaii-West Oahu.
Title
University of Hawaii West Oahu; Hawaii Housing Finance and Development Corporation; Land Transfer
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-12-17 | Carried over to 2016 Regular Session. | |
2015-02-05 | House | The committee(s) on HED recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2015-02-04 | House | Re-referred to HED, WAL, HSG, FIN, referral sheet 8 |
2015-02-02 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HED on Thursday, 02-05-15 2:10PM in House conference room 309. |
2015-02-02 | House | Referred to HED, WAL, HSG, referral sheet 6 |
2015-01-29 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB1226 (Same As) 2016-01-21 - Re-Referred to HOU/HEA, WAM.
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1367&year=2016 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2016/bills/HB1367_.HTM |