HI HB1339 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1339
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-09 - Referred to JDC.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-09 - Referred to JDC.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes requirements for institution of and causes for impeachment of the governor or lieutenant governor.
Title
Relating To Impeachment.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-02 - House - House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, Unamended (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-09 | Senate | Referred to JDC. |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 175). |
2021-03-05 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) DeCoite, Har, Tokioka, Ward voting no (4) and Representative(s) McKelvey excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2021-03-04 | House | Passed Second Reading; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) DeCoite, Har, Tokioka, Ward voting no (4) and Representative(s) Takumi excused (1). |
2021-03-04 | House | Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 776), recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2021-03-02 | House | The committees on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Matayoshi, Ichiyama, D. Kobayashi, LoPresti, McKelvey, Nakamura, Takumi; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Ward; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Tokioka; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Lowen, Todd. |
2021-02-26 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Tuesday, 03-02-21 2:00PM in House conference room 325 Via Videoconference. |
2021-02-01 | House | Referred to JHA, referral sheet 3 |
2021-01-27 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1339 (Carry Over) 2021-03-09 - Referred to JDC.